Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957196

EP0957196 - Front loading laundry washing and/or drying machine, with improved means for the door opening [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
Indesit Company s.p.a.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
Merloni Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Bongini, Dino, c/o Merloni Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Via Campo Sportivo 35
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Dini, Roberto , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100
10060 None (TO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dini, Roberto , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 10
10060 None (TO) / IT
Former [2005/31]Dini, Roberto, Dr. Ing. , et al
c/o Metroconsult S.r.l. Piazza Cavour 3
10060 None (Torino) / IT
Application number, filing date99111796.115.02.1996
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateIT1995TO00039U21.02.1995         Original published format: IT TO950039 U
[1999/46]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0957196
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0957196
Date:02.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/14, D06F37/28
[1999/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/46]
TitleGerman:Frontladerwäschewasch- und/oder trocknermaschine mit Vorrichtungen zum Öffnen der Tür[1999/46]
English:Front loading laundry washing and/or drying machine, with improved means for the door opening[1999/46]
French:Machine à laver et/ou à sécher le linge à chargement frontal avec dispositifs pour ouvrir la porte[1999/46]
Examination procedure10.02.2001Examination requested  [2005/13]
31.01.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2005Fee for grant paid
23.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96102265.4  / EP0728861
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.02.2006  09.03.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Candy S.p.A.
Via privata Eden Fumagalli
20047 Brugherio MI / IT
Opponent's representative
Perani, Aurelio, et al
Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2008/38]
Opponent(s)01  21.02.2006  09.03.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Candy S.p.A.
Via privata Eden Fumagalli
20047 Brugherio MI / IT
Opponent's representative
Perani, Aurelio, et al
Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2006/15]
Opponent(s)01  21.02.2006   
Candy S.p.A.
Via privata Eden Fumagalli
20047 Brugherio MI / IT
Opponent's representative
Perani, Aurelio, et al
Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila 5
I-20122 Milano / IT
08.09.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.03.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.01.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.06.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/49]
Appeal following opposition18.03.2008Appeal received No.  T0582/08
27.05.2008Statement of grounds filed
16.06.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
16.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
22.06.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
18.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.01.2001M01   Fee paid on   10.02.2001
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2264307  (BENDIX HOME APPLIANCES INC.) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 3, line 59 - line 75; figure - * [A] 3,9,10,12,14,15;
 [XA]US3520568  (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [X] 1,3,15 * column W * [A] 4,5,7,14;
 [A]GB2081858  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC AND ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES LIMITED) [A] 1 * figure - *