Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974858

EP0974858 - Mounting for a mirror for guiding a laser beam at a laser processing machine and mirror mount as part of such a mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trumpf GmbH & Co
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Trumpf GmbH & Co
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
D-71254 Ditzingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Andreasch, Wolfgang Dr.Ing.
Weinbergstrasse 2/1
71384 Weinstadt / DE
02 / Häcker, Michael Dipl.-Ing.
Sonnenweg 5
71229 Wimsheim / DE
 [2006/37]
Former [2000/04]01 / Andreasch, Wolfgang Dr.Ing.
Weinbergerstrasse 2/1
71384 Weinstadt / DE
02 / Häcker, Michael Dipl.-Ing.
Sonnenweg 5
71229 Wimsheim / DE
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99111820.919.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE1998213064U22.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29813064 U
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974858
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974858
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974858
Date:13.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/198, G02B7/182, B23K26/02
[2000/45]
Former International [2000/04]G02B7/198
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/30]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lagerung für einen Spiegel zur Führung eines Laserstrahls an einer Laserbearbeitungsmaschine sowie Spiegelflächenträger als Teil einer derartigen Lagerung[2000/04]
English:Mounting for a mirror for guiding a laser beam at a laser processing machine and mirror mount as part of such a mounting[2000/04]
French:Dispositif de support pour miroir de guidage d'un rayon laser dans une machine d'usinage au laser et fixage de miroir faisant partie du dispositif de support[2000/04]
Examination procedure17.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
25.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2006Fee for grant paid
01.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
17.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR13.09.2006
GB13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]GB13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
FR18.05.2007
Former [2008/16]GB13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
Former [2007/30]GB13.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH02214179  ;
 [X]US4863243  (WAKEFIELD EDWARD H) [X] 1-3,7,12 * column 3, line 24 - line 25 *;
 [A]JPH05273450  ;
 [A]JPH05107445  ;
 [A]JPH01228691
 [X]  - AHMAD A, "LOW-COST ADJUSTABLE MIRROR MOUNT", OPTICAL ENGINEERING,US,SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS. BELLINGHAM, (19940601), vol. 33, no. 6, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 2062 - 2064, XP000454695 [X] 1-3,7,12 * chapter 4 *;; figures 3-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.169725
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901113), vol. 014, no. 515, Database accession no. (E - 1000), & JP02214179 A 19900827 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3,7,12 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940125), vol. 018, no. 048, Database accession no. (P - 1682), & JP05273450 A 19931022 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930823), vol. 017, no. 461, Database accession no. (P - 1598), & JP05107445 A 19930430 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891211), vol. 013, no. 555, Database accession no. (M - 904), & JP01228691 A 19890912 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 11 * abstract *
ExaminationCA545976