Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974928

EP0974928 - Chip card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.06.2008  [2008/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sagem Orga GmbH
Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1
33106 Paderborn / DE
[2007/02]
Former [2006/20]For all designated states
Sagem Orga GmbH
Am Hoppenhof 33
33104 Paderborn / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Orga Kartensysteme GmbH
An der Kapelle 2
33104 Paderborn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Isberner, Roland
Tiroler Ring 178
24147 Kiel / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date99111833.219.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813310323.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833103
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974928
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974928
Date:24.01.2001
[2001/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Chipkarte[2000/04]
English:Chip card[2000/04]
French:Carte à puce[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
25.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.11.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, NL, PT
02.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/26]
06.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
17.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200608   M06   Fee paid on   05.09.2006
30.06.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9701823  (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,9 * page 9, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * figures 7,8 * * claims 18,19 *;
 [DA]DE19523242  (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1,4,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5567362  (GRUEN HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,4,9 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 39 *