Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103984

EP1103984 - Container for shipping and/or storing radioactive heat releasing parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GNB Gesellschaft für Nuklear-Behälter mbH
Hollestrasse 7A
45127 Essen / DE
[2001/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Gluschke, Konrad, Dipl.-Ing.
Weberstrasse 11
58739 Wickede / DE
02 / Diersch, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing.
Virchow-Strasse 51
45147 Essen / DE
03 / Methling, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Kehre 9
45525 Hattingen / DE
04 / Heidenreich, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Kastanienweg 17
45739 Oer-Erkenschwick / DE
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Rohmann, Michael , et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Rohmann, Michael, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Theaterplatz 3
45127 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date99111839.919.06.1999
[2001/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103984
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103984
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G21F5/10
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2002/08]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesLT20.04.2000
TitleGerman:Transport- und/oder Lagerbehälter für radioaktive wärmeentwickelnde Elemente[2001/22]
English:Container for shipping and/or storing radioactive heat releasing parts[2001/22]
French:Conteneur de transport et/ou de stockage d'objets radioactifs dégageant de la chaleur[2001/22]
Examination procedure22.10.1999Examination requested  [2001/22]
17.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2002Fee for grant paid
03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
03.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0054944  (STEAG KERNENERGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * [A] 6;
 [A]EP0186487  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 3,6-9; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH09257995  ;
 [A]EP0288838  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claims 1,8-10 *;
 [A]EP0171773  (WIEDERAUFARBEITUNG VON KERNBRE [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 13 - line 26; figures 1-5; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US3962587  (DUFRANE KENNETH H, et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-5; claims 1,3,5 *;
 [DA]DE19725922  (GNB GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. - , & JP09257995 A 19971003 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *