Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974453

EP0974453 - Thermoformable laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-Strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
An der B 43
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Beer, Ekkehard, Dr.
Adolfsecker Weg 15
65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE
02 / Hatke, Wilfried, Dr.
Homburger Strasse 9
65719 Hofheim / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date99111883.721.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813250020.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832500
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974453
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974453
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32, B32B27/30, B32B7/12, C08J5/12
[2000/15]
Former International [2000/04]B32B27/32, B32B27/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Thermoformbare Verbundfolie[2000/04]
English:Thermoformable laminate[2000/04]
French:Laminé thermoformable[2000/04]
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
03.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
02.04.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0649737  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,10 * claims 1,3,5,6,14 * * page 33, line 5 - line 41 * * page 34, line 12 - page 36, line 6 * * example 3 *;
 [PX]EP0920989  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [PX] 1,10 * claims 1-4 * * page 6, line 46 - line 58 * * page 16, line 40 - page 17, line 10 *;
 [DX]EP0570188  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [DX] 1,2,8,10 * claims 1,2,4,5,7,8 * * page 34, line 44 - line 56 * * page 36, line 6 - line 28; examples 4,5 * * table 2 *;
 [X]EP0498384  (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [X] 1,4 * claims 1,5-7,9 * * page 2, column 1, line 18 - line 32 * * page 4, column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 28 * * example 1 *;
 [X]EP0773102  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10 * claims 1,8 * * page 28, line 28 - line 30 * * page 28, line 53 - page 30, line 20 * * examples 2,,COMP.3,,COMP.4 * * table 1 *;
 [X]EP0800914  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,8 * claims 1,3,6,7,10 * * page 12, line 43 - line 54 * * page 15, line 27 - line 56 * * examples 1,,COMP.1 *