blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979658

EP0979658 - Device for repeated registration of thermal cycles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.09.2005  [2005/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maquet Critical Care AB
Röntgenvägen 2
171 95 Solna / SE
[2004/13]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Siemens-Elema AB
Röntgenvägen 2
171 95 Solna / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Skog, Göran
Hildebrandsvägen 32
168 56 Bromma / SE
02 / Krahbichler, Erik
Putsbrunner Strasse 41
81739 München / DE
03 / Slettenmark, Bruno
Fallskärmsvägen 20
175 69 Järfälla / SE
 [2001/46]
Former [2000/07]01 / Skog, Göran
Hildebrandsvägen 32
168 56 Bromma / SE
02 / Krahbichler, Erik
Obere Bachstrasse 14
94315 Straubing / DE
03 / Slettenmark, Bruno
Fallskärmsvägen 20
175 69 Järfälla / SE
Representative(s)Stein, Jan, et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/33]Stein, Jan Anders Lennart, et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/13]Samzelius, Roger Mikael, et al
Maquet Critical Care AB Patent Department
171 95 Solna / SE
Application number, filing date99111899.321.06.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateSE1998000267405.08.1998         Original published format: SE 9802674
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979658
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979658
Date:29.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61L2/28
[2000/07]
CPC:
A61L2/28 (EP,US); A61B18/14 (EP,US); A61B2018/00178 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00988 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/43]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur wiederholbaren Aufnahme von Thermozyklen[2000/07]
English:Device for repeated registration of thermal cycles[2000/07]
French:Dispositif pour l'enregistrement répétitif de cycles thermiques[2000/07]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2004Fee for grant paid
15.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5452335  (SLATER CHARLES R [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,9,11,12,14,15 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 37 * * column 6, line 7 - line 24 * * column 8, line 55 - line 67 * * figures 1,6 *;
 [DX]EP0581400  (ETHICON INC [US]) [DX] 1-3,5,10,11 * column 2, line 1 - line 20 * * column 3, line 43 - line 51 * * column 4, line 10 - line 25 * * figure 1 *;
 [DA]US4449518  (KONOMURA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [DA] 1-3,10 * column 1, line 13 - line 39 * * column 3, line 11 - line 43 * * column 5, line 25 - line 53 *;
 [A]GB1252034  (DRAGERWERK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1 * column L, line 37 - line 47 * * claims 1-7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.