Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0971330 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0971330



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 103
05.08.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.08.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
25.04.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.11.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.11.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.10.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
11.08.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 41
28.09.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
28.09.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.09.1999 European search report Search / examination 2
18.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 12
18.06.1999 Description Search / examination 14
18.06.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.06.1999 Drawings Search / examination 9
18.06.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6