blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0971330


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.08.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  24.09.2003  [2003/39]
31.07.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
23.04.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
15.11.2002 First examination report
06.11.2002 Examination report or reply
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
06.07.2001 Renewal fee
02.02.2001 Change - designated states published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
27.01.2001 Loss of particular rights
17.10.2000 Loss of particular rights
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
08.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
21.01.2000 Request for examination filed published on  08.03.2000 [2000/10]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]