blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0971330
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000106697Global Dossier 11.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US11135598 07.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0971330Global Dossier 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11135598 07.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9902470 14.03.2000A
Priority number Date
US11135598 07.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1244693 16.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US11135598 07.07.1998