Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971330

EP0971330 - Verbal remote control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
10 Farm Springs
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wesson, John P.
39 Donnell Road
Vernon, CT 06066 / US
02 / Morgan, Robert G.
2 Pond View Road
Bolton, CT 06043 / US
03 / Crenella, David
26 Anton Lane
Berlin, CT 06037 / US
04 / Zepke, Bruce E.
186 Lancaster Road
Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US
05 / Bittar, Joseph
31 Longview Road
Avon, CT 06001 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99111901.718.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011135507.07.1998         Original published format: US 111355
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971330
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G08C17/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbale Fernsteuerungseinrichtung[2000/02]
English:Verbal remote control device[2000/02]
French:Dispositif de commande à distance verbal[2000/02]
Examination procedure07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/10]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/39]
25.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5267323  (KIMURA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,5,12 * column 6, line 20 - column 8, line 7; figures 1-5 * * column 11, line 1 - line 49 * [Y] 2-4,6,10,13,15-17,26,27,29-32;
 [Y]DE19608382  (NAZER REZA [DE]) [Y] 2,3,6 * column 1, line 3 - line 23 *;
 [Y]US4534056  (FEILCHENFELD MICHAL M [US], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract *;
 [XY]DE19511386  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,12 * column 1, line 68 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-3 * [Y] 8;
 [Y]GB2226906  (HWANG SHIH MING) [Y] 8 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0514244  (JAY ELECTRONIQUE SA [FR]) [Y] 10,13,15,17,27,29 * abstract *;
 [Y]DE4027491  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 10,13,15,17,27,29 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 13; figure . *;
 [Y]DE19533541  (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 16,17,26,27,29-32 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 68; figure 2 * * column 10, line 43 - line 57 * * column 16, line 39 - line 65 *;
 [X]EP0002435  (RUPPERTSBERG SIEGFRIED R) [X] 1,12 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9403020  (VOICE POWERED TECHNOLOGY INTER [US]) [X] 1,12 * figure 1; claim 1 *