Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970911

EP0970911 - Individual elevator call changing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
One Carrier Place
Farmington CT 06032 / US
[2017/36]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
10 Farm Springs
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zaharia, Vlad
35 Highland Street
Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99111922.322.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011107707.07.1998         Original published format: US 111077
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970911
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970911
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970911
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B66B1/46
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/31]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ausrüstung zur Veränderung idividueller Anrufe[2000/46]
English:Individual elevator call changing device[2000/02]
French:Equippement pour changer un appel individuel d'ascenseur[2000/02]
Former [2000/02]Aufrüstung zur Veränderung Individueller Anrufe
Examination procedure21.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
10.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2005Fee for grant paid
14.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.08.2006   
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
 [2006/38]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.09.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.01.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
20.05.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.05.2012Date of oral proceedings
04.06.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.06.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
31.08.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/07]
31.08.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.07.2012Appeal received No.  T1667/12
05.10.2012Statement of grounds filed
31.08.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.07.2008Appeal received No.  T1454/08
15.09.2008Statement of grounds filed
24.11.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
24.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
31.08.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.09.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PXY]EP0879782  (INVENTIO AG) [PX] 1-3,7-10 * the whole document * [PY] 4-6;
 [YA]JPH05278962  ;
 [XA]US4979594  (BEGLE GUNTRAM ET AL) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 50 * * column 10, line 18 - line 64 * * abstract * [A] 4-6,8,10,11,13,14;
 [A]US4685538  (KAMAIKE HIROSHI) [A] 1,10,11,14 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19608382  (NAZER REZA) [A] 11,14 * the whole document *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940128), vol. 018, no. 056, Database accession no. (M - 1551), & JP05278962 A 19931026 (FUJITA CORP) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * [A] 1,3,10,14