Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969560

EP0969560 - Facial contact for a connector for accessory for a mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL
Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL
Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gallin, Christophe
c/o M. du Besset, Route de l Eventail
72000 Le Mans / FR
02 / Gassies, Janvier
21 rue de Bel-Air
72370 Nuille-Le-Jalais / FR
03 / Le Gallic, Hervé
15 rue de la Grosseillère
72400 Cherreau / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111957.924.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateFR1998000846602.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808466
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969560
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/24
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Frontalkontakt für elektrischen Steckverbinder für Mobilfunktelefonzusatzgeräte[2000/01]
English:Facial contact for a connector for accessory for a mobile telephone[2000/01]
French:Contact facial pour connecteur d'accessoire pour téléphone mobile[2000/01]
Examination procedure06.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
15.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/33]
03.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9320675  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 14 - line 28 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0718918  (CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECH NV [AN]) [A] 1-6 * column 8, line 8 - line 38 * * figures 13A-B *;
 [A]WO9602913  (BERG TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 35 * * figures 4,5,7 *