Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968726

EP0968726 - Process for adding pharmaceutically active compounds to substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.05.2006  [2006/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]For all designated states
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
McNEIL-PPC, INC.
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Morris Yang, Ching-Yun
Bridgewater Drive
Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Groening, Hans Wilhelm
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing.
BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111980.128.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010934230.06.1998         Original published format: US 109342
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968726
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968726
Date:18.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/20, A61K9/70, A61K31/23
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Hinzufügung pharmazeutisch wirksamer Verbindungen zu Substraten[2000/01]
English:Process for adding pharmaceutically active compounds to substrates[2000/01]
French:Procédé pour ajouter des substances pharmaceutiquement actives à des substrats[2000/01]
Examination procedure30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
31.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2005Fee for grant paid
18.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04003639.4  / EP1419790
Opposition(s)21.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0483835  (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 22 * page 5, line 33 - line 36 *;
 [D]US5389734  (DARCY ANDRE [FR], et al);
 [Y]EP0395099  (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-19,21 * page 4, line 5 - line 58 * * page 5, line 11 - line 55 *;
 [D]US5679369  (BROWN-SKROBOT SUSAN KAY [US]);
 [Y]FR2691067  (DIFINTER SA [FR]) [Y] 1-4,7-19,21 * page 4, line 10 - line 11 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 9 *;
 [A]EP0725183  (KELHEIM FASERWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *