Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969461

EP0969461 - Enciphering apparatus, information recording apparatus and record medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hosaka, Sumio, Pioneer Electronic Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Yoshida, Kazuyuki, Pioneer Electronic Corporation
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111987.629.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018534930.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18534998
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969461
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969461
Date:06.02.2002
[2002/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/43]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verschlüsselungsgerät, Informationsaufzeichnungsgerät und Aufzeichnungsmedium[2000/01]
English:Enciphering apparatus, information recording apparatus and record medium[2000/01]
French:Appareil de chiffrage, appareil d'enregistrement d'information et support d'enregistrement[2000/01]
Examination procedure01.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
10.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/24]
24.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0802535  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8,11 * page 13, line 18 - line 21; figure 12; table 2 * * page 22, line 52 - page 23, line 6 *;
 [A]EP0716544  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,8,11 * column 4, line 17 - line 47 *;
 [A]EP0756279  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8,11 * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 46 *;
 [A]EP0593305  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8,11 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 37; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0644474  (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG]) [A] 1,8,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0817185  (TOSHIBA KK [JP])