Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968721

EP0968721 - Use of a composition comprising a peptide for the inhibition of HIV [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.05.2008
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
201 West 7th Street
Austin, Texas 78701 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BOARD OF REGENTS THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
201 West 7th Street
Austin, Texas 78701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sastry, Jagannadha K.
9211 Calridge
Houston, TX 77031 / US
02 / Arlinghaus, Ralph B.
4819 Willow Street
Bellaire, TX 77401 / US
03 / Platsoucas, Chris D.
233 S. 6th. Street 2309
Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US
04 / Nehete, Pramod N.
202 Childer's Drive 824
Bastrop, TX 78602 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2000/12]01 / Sastry, Jagannadha K.
9211 Calridge
Houston, TX 77031 / US
02 / Arlinghaus, Ralph B.
4819 Willow Street
Bellaire, TX 77401 / US
03 / Platsoucas, Chris D.
233 S. 6th. Street #2309
Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US
04 / Nehete, Pramod N.
202 Childer's Drive #824
Bastrop, TX 78602 / US
Former [2000/01]01 / Sastry, Jagannadha K.
9211 Calridge
Houston, TX 77031 / US
02 / Arlinghaus, Ralph B.
4819 Willow Street
Bellaire, TX 77401 / US
03 / Platsoucas, Chris D.
1111 Hermann, Apt. 23c
Houston, TX 77004 / US
04 / Nehete, Pramod N.
202 Childer's Drive #824
Bastrop, TX 78602 / US
Representative(s)Bösl, Raphael Konrad , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstraße 68
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Bösl, Raphael Konrad , et al
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/41]Bösl, Raphael, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112007.202.12.1992
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1991080093202.12.1991         Original published format: US 800932
US1992094586516.09.1992         Original published format: US 945865
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968721
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968721
Date:04.02.2004
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/04, A61K38/16
[2004/06]
Former International [2000/01]A61K39/21
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Anwendung einer Peptide enthaltende Zusammensetzung zur HIV Hemmung[2004/41]
English:Use of a composition comprising a peptide for the inhibition of HIV[2000/01]
French:Utilisation d'une composition peptidique pour l'inhibition du HIV[2000/01]
Former [2000/01]Anwendung einer Peptide enthaltende Zusammensetzung zur HIV Hemmung
Examination procedure04.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
02.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/23]
16.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/23]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93900770.4  / EP0671947
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 13
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 14
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200716   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0339504  (DU PONT [US]);
 [Y]  QURESHI N M ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF A PUTATIVE CELLULAR RECEPTOR FOR HIV-1 TRANSMEMBRANE GLYCOPROTEIN USING SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES", AIDS (LONDON), (1990), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 0269-9370, pages 553 - 558, XP009022874 [Y] 1-10 * figure 1 *
 [Y]  FREED E O ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF CONSERVED RESIDUES IN THE HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 PRINCIPAL NEUTRALIZING DETERMINANT THAT ARE INVOLVED IN FUSION", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, (1991), vol. 7, no. 10, ISSN 0889-2229, pages 807 - 812, XP000882028 [Y] 1-10 * tables 1,2 *
 [Y]  FREED E O ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF THE PRINCIPAL NEUTRALIZING DETERMINANT OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 AS A FUSION DOMAIN", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 65, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 190 - 194, XP009022309 [Y] 1-10 * figure 1; table 1 *
 [Y]  KOITO A ET AL, "A neutralizing epitope of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 has homologous amino acid sequences with the active site of inter-alpha-trypsin inhibitor.", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY. ENGLAND 1989, (1989), vol. 1, no. 6, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 613 - 618, XP009022275 [Y] 1-10 * page 616, column 2, paragraph 1; table 1 *
 [PY]  IVANOFF L A ET AL, "V3 LOOP REGION OF THE HIV-1 GP120 ENVELOPE PROTEIN IS ESSENTIAL FOR VIRUS INFECTIVITY", VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 187, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 423 - 432, XP001156690 [PY] 1-10 * page 427, column 2, paragraph EFFECT....INFECTIVITY *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90444-T
 [PY]  PAGE K A ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF MUTATIONS IN THE V3 DOMAIN OF GP160 THAT AFFECT FUSION AND INFECTIVITY", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 66, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 524 - 533, XP009022302 [PY] 1-10 * figures 1,4,5 *
 [PY]  GRIMAILA R J ET AL, "MUTATIONS IN THE PRINCIPAL NEUTRALIZATION DETERMINANT OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 AFFECT SYNCYTIUM FORMATION VIRUS INFECTIVITY GROWTH KINETICS AND NEUTRALIZATION", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 66, no. 4, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1875 - 1883, XP009023089 [PY] 1-10 * figures 5,6 *
 [A]  RUSCHE J R ET AL, "ANTIBODIES THAT INHIBIT FUSION OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS- INFECTED CELLS BIND A 24-AMINO ACID SEQUENCE OF THE VIRAL ENVELOPE,GP120", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19880501), vol. 85, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3198 - 3202, XP002060890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.9.3198
 [PA]  SASTRY K J ET AL, "RAPID IN VIVO INDUCTION OF HIV-SPECIFIC CD8+ CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES BY A 15-AMINO ACID UNMODIFIED FREE PEPTIDE FROM THE IMMUNODOMINANT V3-LOOP OF GP120", VIROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, US, (1992), vol. 188, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 502 - 509, XP001026217

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90504-I
 [T]  NEHETE PRAMOND N ET AL, "Inhibition of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 infection and syncytium formation in human cells by V3 loop synthetic peptides from gp120", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 67, no. 11, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 6841 - 6846, XP009022421