blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967557

EP0967557 - Similarity-based document retrieval [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.06.2004  [2004/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
For all designated states
CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION
300 Longwood Avenue
Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
For all designated states
CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION
300 Longwood Avenue
Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ackermann, Edith
67 Dana Street No. 4
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
02 / Bromley, Dennis Nathan
11, Lakeview
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
03 / Demaso, David Ray
38 Martin Road
Wellesley, MA 02181 / US
04 / Gibson, Sarah Frances Frisken
15 Mystic View Terrace
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
05 / Gonzalez-Heydrich, Joseph
14 Virginia Street
Dorchester, MA 02125 / US
06 / Karlin, Judith Galler
82 Whittier Road
Wellesley, MA 02181 / US
07 / Marks, Joseph
61 Dalton Road
Belmont, MA 02178 / US
08 / Shen, Chia
3 Apache Trail
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
09 / Strohecker, Carol
295 Harvard Street No. 702
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[1999/52]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112065.022.06.1999
[1999/52]
Priority number, dateUS1998010225822.06.1998         Original published format: US 102258
[1999/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0967557
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0967557
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/30
[1999/52]
CPC:
G06F16/338 (EP,US); G06F16/334 (EP,US); Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S715/968 (US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/52]
TitleGerman:Dokumentwiederauffindung auf Ähnlichkeitsbasis[1999/52]
English:Similarity-based document retrieval[1999/52]
French:Recouvrement de documents à base de similarité[1999/52]
Examination procedure17.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
21.04.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0736834  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 9,24 * column 9, line 13 - line 24 *;
 [XY]US5619709  (CAID WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,18-21,23 * column 14, line 47 - column 15, line 19; figures 5-7 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 32; figure 3 * * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 5 * [Y] 9,24;
 [A]WO9801955  (SURVIVORS OF THE SHOAH VISUAL [US], et al) [A] 1,13,18 * page 18, line 11 - page 20, line 23 *;
 [PX]US5847708  (WOLFF GREGORY J [US]) [PX] 1,2,5-7,13-16,18,19,21-23 * column 4, line 62 - column 10, line 46; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 12 - line 25 *;
 [XY]  - KORFHAGE R R, "TO SEE, OR NOT TO SEE-IS THAT THE QUERY?", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL ACM/SIGIR CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19911013), vol. CONF. 14, pages 134 - 141, XP000239165 [X] 1,2,7,17,18 * page 137, column R, line 29 - page 139, column L, line 4; figure . * * page 140, column L, line 8 - line 26 * [Y] 9,24
 [A]  - RUOCCO A S ET AL, "CLUSTERING AND CLASSIFICATION OF LARGE DOCUMENT BASES IN A PARALLELENVIRONMENT", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION SCIENCE,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION. WASHINGTON, (199710), vol. 48, no. 10, ISSN 0002-8231, page 932-943, XP000723429 [A] 2,3,20 * page 933, column L, line 1 - column R, line 45 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4571(199710)48:10<932::AID-ASI7>3.0.CO;2-2
 [A]  - INSPEC, INSTITUTION of ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002124102 [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.