Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969027

EP0969027 - TFE Polymerization process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solvay Solexis S.p.A.
Via Turati, 12
20121 Milano / IT
[2003/14]
Former [2003/13]For all designated states
AGORA' S.p.A.
Via Turati, 12
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Ausimont S.p.A.
Piazzetta Maurilio Bossi 3
20121 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Marchese, Enrico
Strada Sottoripa 297/A
Quarto Inferiore, Asti / IT
02 / Kapeliouchko, Valery
Largo Catania 8
Alessandria / IT
03 / Colaianna, Pasqua
Via Luigi Varanini 29/c
Milan / IT
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Sama, Daniele
Sama Patents
Via G.B. Morgagni, 2
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Sama, Daniele, Dr.
Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99112083.323.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0151902.07.1998         Original published format: IT MI981519
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969027
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969027
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F283/08, C08F283/06
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:TFE-Polymerisationsverfahren[2000/01]
English:TFE Polymerization process[2000/01]
French:Procédé de polymérisation de TFE[2000/01]
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
21.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2003Fee for grant paid
08.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE23.06.2004
[2005/24]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0816397  (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1-11 * example 1; claim - *;
 [X]WO9622315  (GORE & ASS [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, line 15 - line 36; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]FR1556316  (MONTECATINI EDISON S.P.A) [A] 1-11 * example - *