Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971479

EP0971479 - Line filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tomita, Hiroshi
Shoboji 71-banchi
Toyooka-shi, Hyogo 668-0063 / JP
02 / Oda, Toshinori
2-32-10, Fujisakamotomachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0157 / JP
03 / Ishikawa, Hirotaka
5-18-6-402, Hoshidanishi
Katano-shi, Osaka 573-0015 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99112097.323.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998018599601.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18599698
JP1998036916425.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36916498
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971479
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971479
Date:08.05.2002
[2002/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971479
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:H03H1/00, H01F17/04
[2002/19]
Former International [2000/02]H03H1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/05]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Netzfilter[2000/02]
English:Line filter[2000/02]
French:Filtre de ligne[2000/02]
Examination procedure11.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
08.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2009Fee for grant paid
29.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
18.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB23.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
[2012/30]
Former [2012/23]FR30.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5635890  (YAMAGUCHI KOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 32 - line 62 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 2 * * figure - * [A] 6;
 [A]US5629661  (OOI TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 14; figure - *;
 [A]DE19603779  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 13 - line 33 * * column 5, line 2 - line 64 * * figure - *
ExaminationJPH10172842
 US5994992
 EP0615260
by applicantJPH10172842
 US5635890