EP1063575 - Method of controlling time critical processes by a high speed matrix controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut für Prozesstechnik, Prozessautomatisierung und Messtechnik (IPM) an der HTWS Zittau/Görlitz (FH) Theodor-Körner-Allee 16 02763 Zittau / DE | [2001/37] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states IPM Hochschule fur Technik, Wirtschaft und Sozialwesen Zittau/Görlitz (FH) Theodor-Körner-Allee 16 02763 Zittau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampel, Rainer Oberaue 3 b 02797 Lückendorf / DE | 02 /
Stegemann, Holger Bürgermeister-Dahse-Str. 15 c 18273 Güstrow / DE | 03 /
Worlitz, Frank Teichweg 12 02763 Oberseifersdorf / DE | 04 /
Chaker, Nasredin Innere Weberstr. 1 02763 Zittau / DE | [2000/52] | Application number, filing date | 99112101.3 | 23.06.1999 | [2000/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063575 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02, G05B19/40 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
G05B19/048 (EP);
G05B15/02 (EP);
G05B19/045 (EP);
G05B2219/23289 (EP);
G05B2219/25244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung zeitkritischer Prozesse durch einen High Speed Matrix Controller | [2000/52] | English: | Method of controlling time critical processes by a high speed matrix controller | [2000/52] | French: | Procédé de réglage de processus critiques en temps par un régulateur matriciel à grande vitesse | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19756507 (HOCHSCHULE FUER TECHNIK WIRTSC) [E] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3931962 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH) [A] 1-4 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3911259 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH) [A] 1-4 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5261036 (NAKANO NOBUMASA) [A] * the whole document * |