Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968758

EP0968758 - Use of microphase separated polymer blends for making permeable membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mehler, Christof, Dr.
Mundenheimer Strasse 222
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / Gottschalk, Axel, Dr.
Hirschhornring 33
67435 Neustadt / DE
03 / Breiner, Ulrike, Dr.
Spessartstrasse 7
68642 Bürstadt / DE
04 / Stadler, Reimund Erich, Prof. Dr.
verstorben / / DE
05 / Goldacker, Thorsten
Kriemhildstrasse 6
95445 Bayreuth / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date99112143.524.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812939701.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829397
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968758
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
ClassificationInternational:B01D71/80, B01D53/22
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verwendung mikrophasenseparierter Polymermischungen für die Herstellung von permeablen Membranen[2000/01]
English:Use of microphase separated polymer blends for making permeable membranes[2000/01]
French:Utilisation de mélanges de polymères séparés en microphases pour la fabrication de membranes perméables[2000/01]
Examination procedure12.10.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03