Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968995

EP0968995 - Process for continuously producing ester of acrylic or methacrylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Kenichi, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Kawataka, Futoshi, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck
Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99112144.324.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018582701.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18582798
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968995
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968995
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C67/03, C07C69/54
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Herstellen von Acryl-oder Methacrylsäureester[2000/01]
English:Process for continuously producing ester of acrylic or methacrylic acid[2000/01]
French:Procédé de préparation continue d'ester d'acide acrylique ou méthacrylique[2000/01]
Examination procedure09.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
17.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2002Fee for grant paid
21.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0640583  (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [Y] 1 * page 6, line 12 - line 38 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0040724  (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 15 * * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 19 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB960005  (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 13 - line 49 * * page 3; claim - *