Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974404

EP0974404 - Article with a coating containing a pigment, a fluoropolymer and a binding resin , process for manufacturing it and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weilburger Coatings GmbH
Ahäuser Weg 12-22
35781 Weilburg / DE
[2005/34]
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
Weilburger Coatings GmbH
Ahäuser Weg 12-22
35781 Weilburg / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Weilburger Lackfabrik J. Grebe GmbH
Ahäuser Weg 12-22
D-35781 Weilburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Herber, Jürgen, Dr.
Tannenweg 11
35394 Giessen / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Weber, Dieter , et al
Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45
65051 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Weber, Dieter, Dr. , et al
Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45
65051 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date99112166.624.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813337524.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833375
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974404
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974404
Date:11.12.2002
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974404
Date:24.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B05D5/08, A47J36/02
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   PT [2003/36]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gegenstand mit einer Pigment, Fluorpolymer und Bindeharz enthaltenden Beschichtung, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und dessen Verwendung[2000/04]
English:Article with a coating containing a pigment, a fluoropolymer and a binding resin , process for manufacturing it and use[2000/04]
French:Article avec un revêtement contenant un pigment, un polymère fluoré et une résine liante, procédé pour sa fabrication et son utilisation[2000/04]
Examination procedure09.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
04.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2004Fee for grant paid
02.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI24.08.2005
FR24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
IT24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
PT24.01.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/16]FI24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
IT24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/35]FI24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/26]FI24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/25]FI24.08.2005
GR24.11.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/15]FI24.08.2005
GR24.11.2005
Former [2006/13]FI24.08.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0252669  (EDLON PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-21 * claims 1-7 * * page 5, line 43 - page 6, line 46 * * page 7, lines 9-16 *;
 [X]US5576381  (BLAEDEL HERMANN [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * example 7; claims 1,10,11 *;
 [X]WO9613556  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 9, lines 22-34; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9739073  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-21 * claims 1,6,10 *;
 [X]US4605695  (SAKAMAKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * claim 1 *;
 [PA]DE19732945  (WEILBURGER LACKFABRIK JAKOB GR [DE]) [PA] 1-21 * the whole document *