Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970860

EP0970860 - Gearbox with retarder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Turbo GmbH & Co. KG
Alexanderstrasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Friedrich, Jürgen
Leonhard-Cullmann-Strasse 9
74564 Crailsheim / DE
02 / Vogelsang, Klaus
W.v.Ketteler Strasse 17
74564 Crailsheim / DE
03 / Mandlik, Manfred
Kracker Strasse 91/1
74564 Crailsheim / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date99112167.424.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE1998211787U02.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29811787 U
DE199911870126.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19918701
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970860
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970860
Date:29.03.2000
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970860
Date:16.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60T1/087
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/49]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Getriebe mit Retarder[2000/02]
English:Gearbox with retarder[2000/02]
French:Boite de vitesses avec retardateur[2000/02]
Examination procedure05.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
23.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2002Fee for grant paid
20.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4445178  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - line 36 *;
 [A]US4405038  (TERNEHAELL RUNO R O [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 37 *;
 [A]DE19501853  (VOITH TURBO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4440163  (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE29811787U