Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973035

EP0973035 - Use of derivatized reagents in chemiluminescence and electrochemiluminescence detection procedures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 112-132
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Egger, Martin
Weilheimer Strasse 7 a
82347 Bernried / DE
02 / Josel, Hans-Peter
Prälatenweg 7
82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / Punzmann, Gabriele
Gozbertstrasse 8/10
81547 München / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Weickmann & Partner, Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112194.824.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199812844125.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19828441
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973035
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973035
Date:25.08.2004
Language:DE
[2004/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/58, G01N33/532, C12Q1/68, C07F19/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verwendung derivatisierter Reagenzien in Chemilumineszenz- und Elektrochemilumineszenz-Nachweisverfahren[2000/03]
English:Use of derivatized reagents in chemiluminescence and electrochemiluminescence detection procedures[2000/03]
French:Utilisation d'agents dérivés en procédés de décèlement par chimioluminescence et electrochimioluminescence[2000/03]
Examination procedure24.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
25.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2004Fee for grant paid
14.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL25.08.2004
[2006/14]
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO8706706  (IGEN, INC.) [AD] 1,4,5,12 * claims 1-85 *;
 [A]WO9635812  (IGEN, INC.) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract *;
 [AD]WO9603409  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [AD] 1,4,5 * abstract *;
 [AD]WO9603410  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [AD] 1,4,5 * abstract *;
 [AD]WO9005296  (IGEN, INC.) [AD] 1,4,5 * abstract *;
 [AD]US5310687  (BARD ET AL.) [AD] 1,4,5,10 * column A; claim - *;
 [AD]EP0580979  (A) [AD] 1,4,5,10 * claim - *;
 [AD]EP0178450  (F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO.) [AD] 1,5 * abstract *