Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972938

EP0972938 - Gas ballast device for a multistage positive displacement pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LI
published on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Emmeliusstrasse 33
35614 Asslar / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Bernhardt, Karl-Heinz
Am Wingert 1
35619 Braunfels / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99112217.725.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813112311.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831123
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972938
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972938
Date:28.06.2000
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972938
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04B45/033, F04B37/14, F04B25/00, F04B37/20
[2000/26]
Former International [2000/03]F04B45/033, F04B37/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/10]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gasballasteinrichtung für eine mehrstufige Verdrängerpumpe[2000/03]
English:Gas ballast device for a multistage positive displacement pump[2000/03]
French:Dispositif de ballast de gaz pour une pompe volumétrique à plusieurs étages[2000/03]
Examination procedure11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
17.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2003Fee for grant paid
12.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.06.2004
[2015/26]
Former [2006/42]AT25.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
Former [2005/51]AT25.06.2004
CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
Former [2005/25]CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3710782  (VACUUBRAND GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 5, line 43 - page 6, line 29 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB1253590  (BALZERS PATENT BETEILIG AG [LI]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 85 - page 2, line 52 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2927797  (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2423656  (HUNSINGER EMILE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 16 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19634519  (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0541989  (PFEIFFER VAKUUMTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 37 * * figure 1 *