Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978486

EP0978486 - Method and burner for forming silica-containing soot [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
CORNING INCORPORATED
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sempolinski, Daniel Raymond, Corning Incorporated
Patent Department, SP TI 3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
02 / Wasilewski, Michael, Henry, Corning Incorporated
Patent Department, SP TI 3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
03 / Yu, Charles C., Corning Incorporated
Patent Department, SP TI 3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Marchant, James Ian
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Marchant, James Ian
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99112247.425.06.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS19980095742P07.08.1998         Original published format: US 95742 P
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978486
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978486
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C03B19/14, C03B37/014, C03B19/10
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/42]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Brenner zum Bilden von Siliciumdioxid enthaltenden Russ[2000/06]
English:Method and burner for forming silica-containing soot[2000/06]
French:Procédé et brûleur pour la fabrication de suie contentant la silice[2000/06]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
05.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2004Fee for grant paid
30.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR08.12.2004
[2006/32]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS56155034  ;
 [XA]JPS565337  ;
 [XA]JPH0421536  ;
 [A]JPS5614438  ;
 [A]WO9722553  (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * claims 1-23 *;
 [DA]US5110335  (MILLER THOMAS J [US], et al) [DA] 1,11 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820303), vol. 6, no. 35, [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * abstract *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810415), vol. 5, no. 54, [X] 1,8 * abstract * [A] 11,12
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920427), vol. 16, no. 176, [X] 11,12 * abstract * [A] 1
 [A]  - MORSE T.F. ET AL., "AEROSOL TECHNIQUES FOR FIBER CORE DOPING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. CONF. 14, ISBN 1-55752-166-2, page 63, XP000270360 [A] 1,6,3,6,7 * page 63; figure 2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810425), vol. 5, no. 62, [A] 1,11,12 * abstract *