Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970858

EP0970858 - Belt tensioner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dittrich, Klaus-Jürgen
Schwedenschanze 9c
28832 Achim / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2000/15]
Former [2000/02]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99112250.825.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE1998211538U29.06.1998         Original published format: DE 29811538 U
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970858
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970858
Date:23.10.2002
[2002/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/46, B60R22/195
[2002/43]
Former International [2000/02]B60R22/46
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/29]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gurtstraffer[2000/02]
English:Belt tensioner[2000/02]
French:Prétensionneur de ceinture de sécurité[2000/02]
Examination procedure24.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/04]
20.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.06.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.06.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[DX]DE8502536U  (AUTOFLUG GMBH & CO FAHRZEUGTECHNIK) [DX] 1,7,8,14,15,18,20,21 * page 8, line 17 - page 11, line 17; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE9312135U  (LEICHER GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,8,14,15,20 * page 5, paragraph 9 - page 8, paragraph 4; claim 3 *;
 [X]DE29708880U  (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10-12,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9739923  (TRW REPA GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,7,14,16,18 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 15 - page 11, line 11 *;
 [A]DE4234132  (HS TECH & DESIGN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 16-28; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE8502536U