Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980783

EP0980783 - Seat adjuster [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISE Innomotive Systems Europe GmbH
Othestrasse 19
51702 Bergneustadt / DE
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Janisch, Mirko
Lerchenweg 45
53721 Siegburg / DE
02 / Thiekötter, Uwe
Königsberger Strasse 26
51702 Bergneustadt / DE
03 / Dörre, Wolfgang
Nächtenstrasse 16
51647 Gummersbach / DE
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/08]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date99112301.926.06.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateDE199813734418.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19837344
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980783
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980783
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980783
Date:11.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/02
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/40]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sitzversteller[2000/08]
English:Seat adjuster[2000/08]
French:Dispositif de réglage de siège[2000/08]
Examination procedure10.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2003Fee for grant paid
05.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2021188  (KIEKERT SOEHNE ARN) [X] 1 * page 1, line 67 - line 119; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-8;
 [A]DE3933163  (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2930095  (GRAMMER WILLIBALD FA) [A] 1-3,6-8 * figures 1A,1B; claims 1,3-6 *;
 [A]DE19700629  (ISO DYNAMICS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 4, line 19 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-4,6-9,12-14 *;
 [AD]DE2846632  (KEIPER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH) [AD] 1-4 * figure 4; claims 1,6 *;
 [AD]DE3503897  (TEVES GMBH CO OHG ALFRED [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 14; figure 1 *
by applicantDE3503897
 DE3508515
 DE2846632