Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969595

EP0969595 - Method and apparatus for controlling signal level in digital receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH
Rensingstrasse 15
44807 Bochum / DE
[2002/24]
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH
Postfach 10 18 23
44718 Bochum / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH
Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132
75175 Pforzheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Auranen, Tommi
Kaivokatu 10 B 34
20520 Turku / FI
02 / Vasenkari, Petri
Mestarinkatu 3 as 9
20810 Turku / FI
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo , et al
Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo , et al
Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2000/27]Stendel, Klaus , et al
Nokia GmbH, Patentabteilung, Postfach 101823
44718 Bochum / DE
Former [2000/01]Berges, Jürgen, Nokia Technology GmbH, Abt. NH/P
Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132
75175 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date99112321.726.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateFI1998000151501.07.1998         Original published format: FI 981515
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969595
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969595
Date:13.12.2000
[2000/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03G3/00, H03G3/30
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/01]H03G3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/36]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung des Signalpegels in einem Digitalen Empfänger[2000/01]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling signal level in digital receiver[2000/01]
French:Procédé et dispositif de commande de niveau de signal dans un récepteur numérique[2000/01]
Examination procedure17.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
22.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/21]
09.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/21]
23.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1065471  ;
 [X]EP0413311  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4030035  (IENAKA MASANORI, et al) [A] 1,3 * figure 6 *;
 [A]US5940143  (IGARASHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,3,4 *;
 JPH09163265  [ ] (HITACHI LTD);
 [PX]WO9853579  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-6 * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 13; figure 1 *;
 [PA]EP0913934  (SONY CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,3 * figure 1 *;
 [PA]EP0940957  (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,3 * figure 2 *;
 WO9914914  [ ] (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP], et al)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, [X] 1,3 * abstract *