Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981056

EP0981056 - Method for determining the condition of a pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WILO AG
Nortkirchenstrasse 100
44263 Dortmund / DE
[2003/45]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
WILO GmbH
Nortkirchenstrasse 100
D-44263 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Greitzke, Stephan
Baselerweg 7
44287 Dortmund / DE
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/08]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99112329.026.06.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateDE199813779620.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19837796
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981056
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0981056
Date:04.07.2001
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981056
Date:28.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/34, G01R31/42
[2001/27]
Former International [2000/08]G01R31/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/13]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Ermittlung eines Pumpenzustandes[2003/33]
English:Method for determining the condition of a pump[2000/08]
French:Procédé pour déterminer l'état d'une pompe[2000/08]
Former [2000/08]Verfahren zur Ermittlung des Pumpenzustandes
Examination procedure14.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/07]
24.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2003Fee for grant paid
01.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0915348  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PX] 1,4-7,24 * figure 3 *;
 [X]WO9007813  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 28 - page 8, line 38; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE3436776  (TELDIX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]DE4132745  (ELPRO AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0833436  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-24 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4949362  (GAUBATZ DONALD C [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract *