Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969652

EP0969652 - Image reading apparatus, information processing method, and storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.07.2003  [2003/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Wada, Yoshihiro
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112351.428.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018241229.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18241298
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969652
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969652
Date:21.11.2001
[2001/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00, G03B27/52, H04N1/10, H04N1/047
[2001/47]
Former International [2000/01]H04N1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/32]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildlesgerät, Informationsverarbeitungverfahren, und Speichermedium[2000/01]
English:Image reading apparatus, information processing method, and storage medium[2000/01]
French:Dispositif de lecture d'image, procédé de traitement d'information, et support d'enregistrement[2000/01]
Examination procedure08.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/24]
20.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/27]
03.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5742857  (NANBA KATSUYUKI ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figures 2,5,5,8 * * column 4, line 50 - line 55 * * column 6, line 43 - line 45 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 27 * * column 10, line 1 - line 6 * * claim 1 * [Y] 1-5;
 [EA]US5950027  (ITOH HISANORI ET AL) [E] 1-7 * column 5, line 31 - line 36 * * column 5, line 55 - line 65 * * column 16, line 1 - line 10 * * column 17, line 1 - line 4 * * figures 1-6,10-14,22 * [A] 4;
 JPH09211673  [ ];
 JPH09211672  [ ];
 JPH09211671  [ ];
 [XAY]JPH09211665  ;
 [XYA]US5450149  (COCCA J DAVID) [X] 6,7 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 12 - line 17 * * column 3, line 23 - line 26 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 1-4 [A] 5;
 [XAY]US5287136  (KITAGAWA KIICHIRO ET AL) [X] 6,7 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 10 * [A] 5 [Y] 1,4
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09211673 A 19970815 (MINOLTA CO. LTD)
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09211672 A 19970815 (MINOLTA CO. LTD)
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09211671 A 19970815 (MINOLTA CO. LTD)
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09211665 A 19970815 (MINOLTA CO. LTD) [X] 6,7 * abstract * * figures 1-5,13 * [A] 4 [Y] 1-3,5