Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969156

EP0969156 - Insulation element from straw and its manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schweitzer, Jacob
Dorfstrasse 16
D-85591 Vaterstetten / DE
For all designated states
Vodermair, Hermann
Vaterstettener Strasse 15
D-85598 Baldham / DE
For all designated states
Schimmer-Wottrich, Renate
Heimstättenstrasse 13
D-80805 München / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Brandauer, Edgar, Dr. Ing. habil.
Ibsenweg 4
06126 Halle / DE
02 / Schweitzer, Jacob
Dorfstrasse 13
85591 Vaterstetten / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Kraft, Werner
Patentanwalt
Neuer Weg 12
04600 Altenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Kraft, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.(FH)
Patentanwalt Neuer Weg 12
04600 Altenburg / DE
Application number, filing date99112452.030.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812926101.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829261
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969156
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969156
Date:13.12.2000
[2000/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/76, E04B1/74
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/01]E04B1/74
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Dämmstoffkörper aus Stroh und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2000/01]
English:Insulation element from straw and its manufacturing method[2000/01]
French:Elément d'isolation de paille et son procédé de fabrication[2000/01]
Examination procedure29.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/30]
26.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/09]
10.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3545001  (AVENIR WAERMEDAEMMPLATTEN DIPL [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 29; figures 1,2 * [A] 2;
 [XA]EP0808953  (CASE COMPOUNDS B V [NL]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 40 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 27 * [A] 2;
 [XA]WO9633306  (ECCO GLEITTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, line 1 - line 25 * [A] 2;
 [A]DE19648855  (ALCHIMEA NATURWAREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 59 - line 66 *
by applicantDE3233121
 DE4211888