Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995838

EP0995838 - Utility vehicle with a device to be detachably mounted [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schmidt Holding GmbH
Albtalstrasse 36
79830 St. Blasien / DE
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Duteweert, Wout Bernardus W.
Pimpernel 21
8101 HK Raalte / NL
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 16 55
82306 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Grättinger & Partner (GbR)
Wittelsbacherstrasse 5
82319 Starnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99112523.801.07.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199815665723.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19856657
DE1999207419U27.04.1999         Original published format: DE 29907419 U
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995838
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995838
Date:14.11.2001
[2001/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995838
Date:28.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:E01C19/20
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Lastfahrzeug mit einem darauf abnehmbar aufgebauten Aufsatzgerät[2000/17]
English:Utility vehicle with a device to be detachably mounted[2000/17]
French:Véhicule utilitaire avec dispositif destiné à être monté de manière détachable[2000/17]
Examination procedure06.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
20.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2003Fee for grant paid
26.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.2004  14.10.2004  WITHDRAWN
Küpper-Weisser GmbH
In Stetten 2
D-78199 Bräunlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Höhfeld, Jochen, et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/50]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2004  14.10.2004  WITHDRAWN
Küpper-Weisser GmbH
In Stetten 2
D-78199 Bräunlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Höhfeld, Jochen, et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Former [2004/18]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2004  11.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Küpper-Weisser GmbH
In Stetten 2
D-78199 Bräunlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Höhfeld, Jochen, et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
02.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.10.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.11.2004Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
09.12.2004Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI28.05.2003
IE28.05.2003
CY01.07.2003
LU01.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]FI28.05.2003
IE28.05.2003
CY01.07.2003
LU01.07.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/36]FI28.05.2003
IE28.05.2003
CY01.07.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/15]FI28.05.2003
IE28.05.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI28.05.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/03]GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/02]GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE3737220  (PIETSCH MAX KG GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2423462  (BECK HERMANN) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE3737220