blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970831

EP0970831 - Heating system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADAM OPEL AG
65423 Rüsselsheim / DE
[2005/41]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ADAM OPEL AG
65423 Rüsselsheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jordan, Frank, Dipl.-Physiker
Friedensplatz 10
65428 Rüsselsheim / DE
02 / Sünner, Tobias, Dr.rer.nat.
Richtergasse 16
65428 Rüsselsheim / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Daniel, Ulrich W.P., et al
Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 80-34
65423 Rüsselsheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/29]Daniel, Ulrich W.P., et al
Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 80-34
65423 Rüsselsheim / DE
Former [2000/02]Kümpfel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Adam Opel AG, Patentwesen / 80-30
65423 Rüsselsheim / DE
Application number, filing date99112534.501.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813027407.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19830274
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970831
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970831
Date:02.05.2002
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970831
Date:12.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationIPC:B60H1/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
B60H1/00285 (EP,US); B60H1/00964 (EP,US); B60N2/5685 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/04]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Heizungsanlage für Kraftfahrzeuge[2000/02]
English:Heating system for a motor vehicle[2000/02]
French:Système de chauffage pour véhicules automobiles[2000/02]
Examination procedure18.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
05.11.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.03.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2005Fee for grant paid
08.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.12.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5330385  (HOTTA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 7, line 3 - line 59; figures 4,5 *;
 [ADP]DE19735977  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE])
by applicantDE19735977
 DE4139580
 DE4141224
 DE4318432
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.