Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976882

EP0976882 - Joint sealing body [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salamander Industrie-Produkte GmbH
Jakob-Sigle-Strasse 58
D-86842 Türkheim / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Lukat, Wolfgang
Römerstrasse 23
87700 Memmingen / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Körner, Ekkehard
Patentanwalt Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Körner, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112557.601.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE1998213307U27.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29813307 U
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976882
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976882
Date:13.12.2000
[2000/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/68
[2000/05]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/36]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fugendichtungskörper[2000/05]
English:Joint sealing body[2000/05]
French:Corps d'étanchéité pour joint[2000/05]
Examination procedure14.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/13]
11.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.07.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE4307528  (ILLBRUCK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - column 3, line 39; figure 3 * [Y] 2,3;
 [YA]DE3409535  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 2,3 * page 7, line 20 - page 7, line 27; figure 1 * [A] 7;
 [A]DE3831534  (IRBIT RESEARCH & CONSULTING AG [CH]) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *
by applicantFR1544724