Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971224

EP0971224 - Testing method and device for evaluating the deep-drawing ability of welded sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salzgitter AG
Gerhard-Lucas-Meyer-Strasse 3-5
31226 Peine / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Overrath, Jens, Dipl.-Ing
Celler Strasse 24 d
38114 Braunschweig / DE
02 / Baumgarth, Marco
Rudolplatz 14
38118 Braunschweig / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur. , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date99112618.602.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813088810.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19830888
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971224
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971224
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N3/28
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Prüfverfahren und Prüfvorrichtung für die Beurteilung der Tiefziehfähigkeit von zusammengeschweissten Blechen[2000/02]
English:Testing method and device for evaluating the deep-drawing ability of welded sheets[2000/02]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour l'évaluation de l'emboutissabilité de tôles soudées[2000/02]
Examination procedure23.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
17.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/24]
09.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0173184  (LAPPLE GMBH & CO AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 9 *;
 [A]US3139749  (HUBERTUS ZAAT JOHANNES) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2875608  (ENGELHARDT WERNER H, et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2612278  (FISCHER FRITZ PROF DR) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE568222  (KAISER WILHELM INST FUER EISEN) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [DA]  TIEFUNGSVERSUCH AN BLECHEN UND BAENDERN MIT EINER BREITE VON >90 NM(NACH ERICHSEN), DEUTSCHE NORMEN DIN 50101, 1979, SEITEN 16-22;, XP002135026 [DA] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *
 [A]  TSUTSUMI S ET AL, "A NEW APPARATUS FOR ESTIMATING DIE PROFILE FRICTION IN DEEP DRAWING", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, SERIES B: JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING FOR INDUSTRY,US,ASME. NEW YORK, (19940501), vol. 116, no. 2, ISSN 0022-0817, pages 183 - 188, XP000457102 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *