Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971170

EP0971170 - Method for dewatering ash [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/02]Method for dewatering ashes
[2002/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BBP Service GmbH
Duisburger Strasse 375
46049 Oberhausen / DE
[2002/47]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
BBP Energy GmbH
Duisburger Strasse 375
46049 Oberhausen / DE
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Babcock Kraftwerkstechnik GmbH
Duisburger Strasse 375
46049 Oberhausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bleckmann, Karl
Quadenweg 33
46485 Wesel / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Radünz, Ingo
Patentanwalt
Schumannstrasse 100
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Radünz, Ingo, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Ed.-Schloemann-Strasse 55
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99112623.602.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813094310.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19830943
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971170
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971170
Date:01.03.2000
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971170
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F23J1/02, F26B17/26, B01D29/05, B01D29/86
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Entwässerung von Asche[2000/02]
English:Method for dewatering ash[2002/48]
French:Procédé pour la déshydratation de cendres[2000/02]
Former [2000/02]Method for dewatering ashes
Examination procedure16.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
18.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.09.2002Fee for grant paid
26.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE27.11.2002
CY02.07.2003
LU02.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]IE27.11.2002
CY02.07.2003
LU02.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2004/36]IE27.11.2002
CY02.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2004/33]IE27.11.2002
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2003/42]IE27.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0029235  (COMBUSTION ENG [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [X]EP0492541  (MARTIN UMWELT & ENERGIETECH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE2856431  (SCHAUENBURG MASCH) [DA] 4 * the whole document *
by applicantDE2856431
 DE3013668