Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990840

EP0990840 - Dimmable illumination device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Döll, Gerhard, Dr.
Johann-Stockar-Weg 42
89075 Ulm / DE
[2000/14]
Application number, filing date99112644.202.07.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814488930.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844889
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990840
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:F21V8/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dimmbare Beleuchtungsvorrichtung[2000/14]
English:Dimmable illumination device[2000/14]
French:Dispositif d'illumination dont on peut varier l'ntensité lumineuse[2000/14]
Examination procedure03.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/37]
05.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3399476  (DAVIS JAMES F) [X] 1-3 * column 7; figures 11,12 *;
 [A]US4244130  (FROIS MAURICIO) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]EP0607453  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP0607453