blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969315

EP0969315 - Photographic base paper with a gold coloured print on the backside [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Felix Schoeller jr Foto- und Spezialpapiere GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
49086 Osnabrück / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Felix Schoeller jr Foto- und Spezialpapiere GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
49086 Osnabrück / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ebisch, Rolf, Dr.
Holtkämpers Weg 9
49076 Osnabrück / DE
02 / Berner, Hans-Ulrich
Iburger Strasse 50
49176 Hilter / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99112647.502.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812999304.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829993
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969315
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969315
Date:08.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:G03C1/79, D21H19/38
[2000/01]
CPC:
D21H19/38 (EP); G03C1/79 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fotografisches Basispapier mit goldfarbenem Druck auf der Rückseite[2000/01]
English:Photographic base paper with a gold coloured print on the backside[2000/01]
French:Papier support photographique avec imprimé doré au dos[2003/16]
Former [2000/01]Papier de base photographique avec un imprimé ayant la couleur d'or sur la face arrière
Examination procedure10.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
13.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2003Fee for grant paid
09.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
PT08.03.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]CY08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2004/46]FI08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2004/41]FI08.10.2003
DK08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI08.10.2003
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE08.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3150492  (HERBERTS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0858000  (SCHOELLER FELIX JUN FOTO [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [D]DE19704819  (SCHOELLER FELIX JUN FOTO [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.