Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976616

EP0976616 - Monitor arrangement in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Allershausen, Eckhardt
Mittenwalder Strasse 37 a
81377 München / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date99112674.902.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813456231.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19834562
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976616
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976616
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R11/02
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung eines Bildschirms in einem Fahrzeug[2000/05]
English:Monitor arrangement in a vehicle[2000/05]
French:Dispositif d'affichage dans un véhicule[2000/05]
Examination procedure25.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
10.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2002Fee for grant paid
03.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08276793  ;
 [A]JPH06107083  ;
 [A]JPH03118251  ;
 [A]JPH0495543  ;
 [A]EP0626292  (SICMA AERO SEAT [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]JPH05201289
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940720), vol. 018, no. 386, Database accession no. (M - 1641), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910814), vol. 015, no. 318, Database accession no. (M - 1146), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920720), vol. 016, no. 331, Database accession no. (M - 1282), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931126), vol. 017, no. 639, Database accession no. (M - 1515), [A] 1 * abstract *