Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972610

EP0972610 - Construction kit for a component holding device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Donath, Norbert
Am Bründl 13
82343 Pöcking / DE
02 / Pfeiffer, Horst
Bruckmühler Strasse 69
83052 Bruckmühl / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99112681.402.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813151314.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831513
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972610
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972610
Date:24.04.2002
[2002/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972610
Date:29.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23Q3/10, B25B11/02
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Elementsystem zum Aufbauen von Haltevorrichtungen für Bauteile[2000/03]
English:Construction kit for a component holding device[2000/03]
French:Système d'éléments pour la construction de dispositif de support de composants[2000/03]
Examination procedure27.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
27.11.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
10.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2003Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2004Fee for grant paid
26.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI29.09.2004
IE29.09.2004
NL29.09.2004
DK29.12.2004
GR29.12.2004
PT28.02.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FI29.09.2004
IE29.09.2004
NL29.09.2004
DK29.12.2004
GR29.12.2004
Former [2005/46]FI29.09.2004
IE29.09.2004
DK29.12.2004
GR29.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI29.09.2004
IE29.09.2004
GR29.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI29.09.2004
GR29.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI29.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE29603081U  (WITTE HORST ENTWICKLUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0730320  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] * Siehe das ganze Dokument *;
 [A]US3205522  (THEN KARL P) [A] * Siehe das ganze Dokument *
by applicantGB587448