blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969592

EP0969592 - Signal receiver and method thereof, transceiver, and network system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 616 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyou-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawashima, Hidemitsu, c/o Omron Corporation
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto 616-8025 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Akihiko, c/o Omron Corporation
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto 616-8025 / JP
03 / Toguchi, Yoichi, c/o Omron Corporation
10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto 616-8025 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Käck, Jürgen, et al
Patentanwälte
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]Käck, Jürgen, et al
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Former [2000/01]Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Application number, filing date99112711.930.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018354930.06.1998         Original published format: JP 18354998
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969592
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969592
Date:19.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:H03D11/00
[2000/01]
CPC:
H03D11/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Signalempfänger und zugehörendes Verfahren, Sende-Empfangsgerät, und Netzwerkssystem[2000/01]
English:Signal receiver and method thereof, transceiver, and network system[2000/01]
French:Récepteur de signaux et méthode de réception associée, émetteur/récepteur, et système réseau[2000/01]
Examination procedure31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
04.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2003Fee for grant paid
10.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0794622  (ATRAL [FR]) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 24 - column 10, line 39; figures 1,7 *;
 [A]US4393514  (MINAKUCHI YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 22 - column 8, line 68; figures 5,6,9,11,13 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.