blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969024 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969024



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1028
12.08.2015 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
11.03.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
04.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.02.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 61
09.11.2009 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 9
07.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.10.2009 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
05.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.09.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.09.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.08.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.07.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
27.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.07.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.07.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 6
15.01.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.01.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 32
24.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
08.10.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.09.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
29.09.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.09.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
24.09.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 16
10.08.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
03.08.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.08.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.07.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.07.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
29.03.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.03.2007 Claims Appeal 1
21.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
21.03.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
08.02.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.01.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
17.01.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
22.11.2006 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
22.11.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.11.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
27.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 24
15.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
15.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
14.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
27.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
15.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
13.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.12.2005 Claims Opposition 3
06.12.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
10.08.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.08.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.08.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.07.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
24.06.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
24.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.06.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
23.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
23.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
23.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
22.06.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
22.06.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
12.08.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.05.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.01.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.01.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
23.01.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
18.09.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.07.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
01.07.1999 Description Search / examination 49
01.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
01.07.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 43