blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969024


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2010  [2010/28]
12.03.2010 Revocation of patent published on  14.04.2010  [2010/15]
20.02.2010 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
29.01.2010 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  03.03.2010  [2010/09]
05.11.2009 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.10.2009 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
15.07.2009 Change: Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2009 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.06.2008 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]
27.03.2007 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
18.01.2007 Change: Appeal number
18.01.2007 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
18.11.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2006 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
11.05.2006 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2006 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  17.05.2006  [2006/20]
09.12.2005 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.08.2005 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  28.09.2005  [2005/39]
29.07.2005 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
08.07.2005 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  24.08.2005  [2005/34]
01.07.2005 Unpublished change to opponent data
01.07.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit
01.07.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: receipt of reply
01.07.2005 Opposition filed published on  17.08.2005  [2005/33]
28.06.2005 Unpublished change to opponent data
28.06.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit
06.08.2004 (Expected) grant published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
30.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.05.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.01.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.01.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2002 Renewal fee
28.07.2001 Renewal fee
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
11.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
29.09.2000 Request for examination filed published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
25.02.2000 Publication of search report published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]