Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969024

EP0969024 - Detergent builder, production process therefor, and poly(meth)acrylic acid (or salt) polymer and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.03.2010
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shioji, Shorbu
6-148, Imazaike, Shikama-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 672-8079 / JP
02 / Yamaguchi, Shigeru
5-112-4, Koorigawa
Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0872 / JP
03 / Maeda, Yoshihiro
2-11-1-108, Nishigawara
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0023 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112716.801.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018745602.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18745698
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969024
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969024
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969024
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F20/06, C11D3/37
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/52]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Waschmittelbilder, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Poly(meth)acrylsäure (oder Salz) Polymer und seine Verwendung[2000/01]
English:Detergent builder, production process therefor, and poly(meth)acrylic acid (or salt) polymer and use thereof[2000/01]
French:Adjuvant de détergence, procédé de sa préparation et polymère d'acide (meth)acrylique (ou sel) et son usage[2000/01]
Examination procedure18.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
23.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2004Fee for grant paid
19.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005  30.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
Opponent's representative
Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
 02  22.06.2005  01.07.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Weingarten, Ulrich, et al
BASF SE
Global Intellectual Property
GVX - C6
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/09]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005  30.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US
Opponent's representative
Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
 02  22.06.2005  01.07.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Weingarten, Ulrich, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2009/46]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005  30.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US
Opponent's representative
Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
 02  22.06.2005  01.07.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Paashaus, Sabine, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005  30.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US
Opponent's representative
Kent, Venetia Katherine
Rohm and Haas European Patent Department, 4th Floor 22 Tudor Street
London EC4Y 0AY / GB
 02  22.06.2005  01.07.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Paashaus, Sabine, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2006/20]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005  30.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US
Opponent's representative
Kent, Venetia Katherine
Rohm and Haas European Patent Department, 4th Floor 22 Tudor Street
London EC4Y 0AY / GB
 02  22.06.2005  01.07.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Paashaus, Sabine, et al
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2005/39]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005  30.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US
Opponent's representative
Kent, Venetia Katherine
Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Patent Department 28th. Floor, City Point One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
 02  22.06.2005  01.07.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Paashaus, Sabine, et al
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2005/33]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005  30.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106-2399 / US
Opponent's representative
Kent, Venetia Katherine
Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Patent Department 28th. Floor, City Point One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
 02  22.06.2005  01.07.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Jackson, Richard Eric, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
02.08.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.12.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
22.11.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.11.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
28.10.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/15]
Appeal following opposition15.01.2007Appeal received No.  T0066/07
21.03.2007Statement of grounds filed
28.10.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
28.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB01.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
[2010/28]
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0586125  ;
 [A]FR2590261  (MIRET LAB [ES])
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 18, Database accession no. 93149247, XP002130601 & JPH0586125 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO. LTD.) [A] * abstract *