Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969061

EP0969061 - Underfill encapsulants prepared from allylated amide compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington
Delaware 19803-7663 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663
Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schultz, Rose Ann
5 Dana Drive
Westford, Massachusetts 01886 / US
02 / Herr, Donald
5 Hope Court
Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US
03 / Xiao, Chaodong
16 Heritage Drive
East Hanover, New Jersey 07936 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Held, Stephan , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112723.401.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS19980091507P02.07.1998         Original published format: US 91507 P
US1999033663318.06.1999         Original published format: US 336633
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969061
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969061
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09J4/00, C08F290/06, C08F299/02, H05K3/38, H01L23/29
[2000/08]
Former International [2000/01]C09J4/00, C08F290/06, C08F299/02, H05K3/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/45]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Unterfüllungs-Einkapselungen hergestellt aus Allyl-Amid-Verbindungen[2000/01]
English:Underfill encapsulants prepared from allylated amide compounds[2000/01]
French:Compositions d'encapsulage à sous remplissage préparés à partir de composés d'amide allylès[2000/01]
Examination procedure27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
24.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
05.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI
01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/40]
05.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4540650  (KLUG RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,9 *;
 [A]EP0559338  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1;
 [A]WO9827177  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0855940  ;
 [A]JPH10101796  ;
 [A]EP0390565  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6 *;
 [A]EP0028994  (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH02247273  ;
 [A]EP0208634  (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901217), vol. 014, no. 566, Database accession no. (C - 0789), [A] 1 * abstract *