Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969235

EP0969235 - Hydraulic diaphragm-actuated valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rafael Magofim (1975) Ltd.
North Industrial Zone
Or Akiva 30600 / IL
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Frenkel, Boris, Dr.
Rehov Ezel 4
Netania 42320 / IL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/01]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112730.901.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateIL1998012519602.07.1998         Original published format: IL 12519698
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969235
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969235
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/126
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GR,   IT [2001/34]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hydraulisches membrangesteurtes Ventil[2000/01]
English:Hydraulic diaphragm-actuated valve[2000/01]
French:Soupape commandée par hydraulique à membrane[2000/01]
Examination procedure05.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
07.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, FI, GB, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
24.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/33]
09.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4198030  (CALDWELL RICHARD F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4432652  (MAGDEBURGER ARMATURENWERKE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3707985  (HAASE E, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 13 - line 17 * * column 2, line 52 - line 55; figure 1 *