Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968955

EP0968955 - Composite material jib [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.08.2009
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
07.08.2009New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grove U.S. LLC
1565 Buchanan Trail East Shady Grove
Pennsylvania 17256 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Grove U.S. LLC
1565 Buchanan Trail East
Shady Grove, Pennsylvania 17256 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Paschke, Franz
Eichenweg 25
26452 Sande / DE
02 / Vohdin, Kurt
Feldhörn 9
26340 Zetel / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112763.001.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE1998102982903.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829829
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968955
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968955
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968955
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B66C23/70, B29C67/24
[2004/09]
Former International [2000/49]B66C23/70, B29C67/14
Former International [2000/01]B66C23/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/34]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ausleger aus Verbundwerkstoff[2000/01]
English:Composite material jib[2000/01]
French:Flèche de matériau composite[2000/01]
Examination procedure09.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
07.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2003Fee for grant paid
05.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.11.2004  06.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Terex-Demag GmbH & Co. KG
Dinglerstrasse 24
66482 Zweibrücken / DE
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Matthias
Rau, Schneck & Hübner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/32]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2004  06.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Terex-Demag GmbH & Co. KG
Dinglerstrasse 24
66482 Zweibrücken / DE
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Matthias
Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2
D-90402 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2005/24]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2004  06.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Terex-Demag GmbH & Co. KG
Dinglerstrasse 24
66482 Zweibrücken / DE
Opponent's representative
Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Former [2005/03]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2004  06.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Terex-Demag GmbH & Co. KG
Dinglerstrasse 24
66482 Zweibrücken / DE
Opponent's representative
Preuss, Udo, Dipl.-Ing.
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.04.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.09.2006Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.10.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
24.06.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/37]
24.06.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition08.12.2006Appeal received No.  T1869/06
13.02.2007Statement of grounds filed
24.06.2009Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
24.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2634081  (LECHLEITNER KLAUS) [X] 1,2,10,12 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5,11;
 [Y]GB1326943  (FISCHER H C, et al) [Y] 3,5 * page 5, lines 80-126 *;
 [Y]US3997695  (GITT EDWARD, et al) [Y] 11 * column W *;
 [A]FR2539729  (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]);
 [A]DE4328459  (EURAPLAN INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT [DE]);
 [A]EP0507220  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP])
by applicantEP0117774