Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975016

EP0975016 - Wafer flattening process and system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Speedfam Co., Ltd.
30-3, Nishirokugou 4-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Horiike, Yasuhiro
2-12, Higashifushimi 3-chome Houya-shi
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Speedfam Co., Ltd.
30-3, Nishirokugou 4-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Horiike, Yasuhiro
2-12, Higashifushimi 3-chome
Houya-shi, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yanagisawa, Michihiko
Hayakawa 2647
Ayase-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Iida, Shinya
Hayakawa 2647
Ayase-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Horiike, Yasuhiro
2-12 Higashifushimi 3-chome
Houya-shi, Tokyo / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112771.301.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020554821.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20554898
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975016
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3065, H01L21/3105, H01L21/311, H01L21/3213, H01L21/00, H01J37/32
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/48]
Former [2000/42]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2000/41]DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wafer-Planarisierungsverfahren[2000/04]
English:Wafer flattening process and system[2000/04]
French:Procédé et dispositif de planarisation[2000/04]
Examination procedure25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.09.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2000
01.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH09115887  (SPEEDFAM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [A] 7,10,11;
 [A]US4412885  (WANG DAVID N [US], et al) [A] 3 * abstract * * column 7, lines 45-60 *;
 [A]US4936940  (KAWASUMI KEN-ICHI [JP], et al) [A] 5,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5240554  (HORI MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 7 * column 23, line 7 - column 24, line 11 * * figure 18 *;
 [A]US5108543  (SUZUKI KEIZO [JP], et al) [A] 7 * column 4, lines 4-11 * * column 9, lines 18-27 * * figures 3,10-12 *
by applicantJPH0927482