Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970698

EP0970698 - Use of D-galactose for preventing necrosis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Afting, Ernst-Günter, Prof. Dr. Dr.
Meisenweg 21
82152 Krailling / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Bösl, Raphael Konrad , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstraße 68
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Bösl, Raphael Konrad , et al
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Former [2003/15]Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 860 880
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112790.302.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE1998102984403.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829844
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970698
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970698
Date:06.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7004, A61K31/7016, A61K31/702, A61K31/7024, A61P43/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von D-Galaktose zur Verhinderung von Nekrosen[2000/02]
English:Use of D-galactose for preventing necrosis[2000/02]
French:Utilisation de D-galactose pour prévenir la necrose[2000/02]
Examination procedure18.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
10.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2004Fee for grant paid
23.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
15.06.2004Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
12.07.2004Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
SE06.01.2005
PT06.03.2005
CY02.07.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/21]FI06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
SE06.01.2005
CY02.07.2005
Former [2007/18]FI06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
SE06.01.2005
Former [2005/46]FI06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
Former [2005/26]FI06.10.2004
GR06.01.2005
Former [2005/24]FI06.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0922459  (REUTTER WERNER ;AFTING ERNST GUENTER PROF DR D (DE)) [PX] 1-11 * claims 1-17 *;
 [X]DE3935906  (REUTTER WERNER) [X] 1-11 * page 4, lines 43-46 * * page 56, lines 22-37 *;
 [X]JPH04312533  ;
 [X]JPH059114
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 51, Database accession no. 1992-418587, XP002118886 & JPH04312533 A 19921104 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [X] 1-11 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 08, Database accession no. 1993-061598, XP002118887 & JPH059114 A 19930119 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-11 * abstract *